U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Henderson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • December 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 27, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • December 22, 2022: [Status Conference ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order setting Telephone Conference]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Indictment]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.