U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00623-DAR-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Seals, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 18, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.