U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boyd et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Bond]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 05, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 05, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 05, 2023: [In Chambers Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Pretrial Conference ]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 18, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • November 15, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • November 14, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • November 14, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 14, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • November 14, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 10, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 10, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 09, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 09, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 09, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.