U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00215-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Isaac
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 21, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 07, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • December 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.