U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mccomb
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Transcript]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Speedy Trial - Location Start]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Status Report]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ]
  • November 11, 2022: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 09, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.