U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00209-JPC-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hoyle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 10, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.