U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00130-12
  • Case Name: USA v. Jose Daniel Zazueta-Hernandez, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Status Conference ]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 19, 2023: [USCA Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 05, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 05, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 26, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2022: [Transcript]
  • December 13, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 05, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 01, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 29, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • November 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 13, 2022: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.