U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00612-SL-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carroll, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 15, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.