U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lucas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Suppress ]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • November 15, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.