U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ndum
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2023: [Status Conference ]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 01, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • November 29, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 29, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 16, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.