U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00222-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Solomon et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: [USCA Order]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Vacate (2255)]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Deadline]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Deadline]
  • March 12, 2025: [Appear - Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2025
  • January 03, 2025: [Reply to Response]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Continue ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 04, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Document]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 10, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Status Conference ]
  • January 07, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.