U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00661-JGC-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Claudio-Curruchich et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2023: [Judgment ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 02, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 02, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • December 01, 2022: [Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Referral]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.