U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00664-DAP-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gutierrez, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • December 12, 2022: [CJA 21 - Appointment ]
  • December 12, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • December 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 18, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed) ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.