U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00663-CEF-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Randle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Suppress ]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.