U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00223-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Giri
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • December 23, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Arraignment ]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 21, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 18, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.