U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00670-CEF-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Hereford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Referral]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.