U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00086-JG-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Salter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 23, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.