U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peterson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Arraignment ]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 29, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • November 29, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 28, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 28, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.