U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00648-SO-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gates, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.