U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hughes et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 08, 2024: [Specialty Court]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 20, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 18, 2023: [Status Report]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sever Defendant]
  • January 06, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response in Opposition]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 28, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 27, 2022: [Transcript]
  • December 22, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 20, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2022: [Revoke]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 06, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • December 06, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 06, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 30, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • November 29, 2022: [Unseal Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.