U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00680-DAR-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Semuso
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: [Judgment ]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.