U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00643-BMB-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Varner, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 09, 2024: [Reduce Sentence - 821 Amendment]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 08, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • December 01, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • December 01, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.