U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00307-PAB-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Kalantarli, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • January 17, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Referral]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.