U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FUGATE, ET AL.,
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 23, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • December 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • December 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 06, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • December 05, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • December 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 05, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • December 05, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.