U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROUSSARD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Transcript]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 06, 2023: [Status Conference ]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • December 13, 2022: [Bond Hearing ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • December 05, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • December 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 05, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • December 05, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.