U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00688-JG-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • April 10, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Regarding Violation Report (Summons)]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.