U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00227-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 05, 2023: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 04, 2023: [Bond Hearing ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Waiver of Indictment]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 06, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.