U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taborn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • December 22, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • December 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 20, 2022: [Appear - Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 19, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • December 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 14, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 06, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.