U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00231-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Welch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 11, 2023: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2022: [Waiver of Right to Appear in Person]
  • December 13, 2022: [Consent to Plead Guilty Before U.S. Magistrate Judge]
  • December 13, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 07, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.