U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Golobic
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 18, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 17, 2025: [USCA Information Copy]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • March 28, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 20, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
  • March 14, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 09, 2025: [Supplemental - Supporting (non motion)]
  • March 08, 2025: [Supplemental - Supporting (non motion)]
November, 2024
  • November 15, 2024: [Transcript]
  • November 14, 2024: [Transcript]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Protective Order]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • December 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 14, 2022: [Bond Hearing ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • December 09, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 08, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • December 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 08, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • December 07, 2022: [Seal Case]
  • December 07, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed) ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.