U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cox
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • December 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 09, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • December 09, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • December 08, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.