U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00694-BMB-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gilbert
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 09, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • December 09, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.