U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00686-PAG-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Powell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Designate Case Complex]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • December 13, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • December 13, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.