U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez-Guzman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 13, 2022: [Indictment]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 13, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.