U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jaques
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Return of Property/PostTrial]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 11, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Conference ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 13, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.