U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 17, 2023: [Status Conference ]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Related Case Memorandum]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • December 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.