U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 24, 2023: [Suppress ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • December 19, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • December 16, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.