U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00721-CAB-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Woolley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.