U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00700-DCN-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release re First Step Act of 2018 ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • December 20, 2022: [Bill of Particulars ]
  • December 16, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.