U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00726-DCN-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Baker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay ]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2023: [Protective Order ]
  • January 03, 2023: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • December 16, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.