U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00193-DAR-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Suppress ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Travel ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.