U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00653-CEF-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Banks, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order of Detention ]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 29, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • December 29, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 19, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.