U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00720-SO-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Referral]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Expert]
  • January 05, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Appoint Expert ]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 20, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • December 20, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.