U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00722-PAG-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • December 22, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.