U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00708-SL-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sylver
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 09, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 08, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 12, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 21, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.