U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00709-JRA-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Crenshaw
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order of Detention ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • December 22, 2022: [Revoke]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • December 21, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.