U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00707-DAR-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 05, 2023: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.