U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00566-CEF-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCoy, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order of Detention ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order of Detention ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 12, 2023: [Seal Document]
  • January 12, 2023: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.