U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00535-CAB-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kovacic
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 28, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
December, 2024
  • December 05, 2024: [Suppress ]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Appoint Counsel ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.