U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00122-JRK-17
  • Case Name: United States v. Christopher, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Regarding Violation Report (Summons)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Travel ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Travel ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Travel ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Reconsideration ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 20, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 19, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Regarding Violation Report (Summons)]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 12, 2025: [Minute Order - Pretrial Conference]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Expert]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Travel ]
October, 2024
  • October 29, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 17, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Travel ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Protective Order ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Vacate ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 04, 2024: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 03, 2024: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 03, 2024: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 03, 2024: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.